LANCASTER WEST CHILDREN'S COMMUNITY NETWORK

Charity number: 1078316
Charity reporting is up to date (22 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £244.39k £253.58k £409.97k £406.49k £280.61k
Total expenditure £229.65k £268.01k £292.93k £331.31k £205.13k
Income from government contracts £158.21k £179.55k £181.46k £244.67k £213.51k
Income from government grants £12.53k £0 £2.53k N/A £3.97k