UGANDAN SUPPORT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Ugandan support provides care for the people of Uganda in particular in Busia. Apart from the care of orphaned and underprivileged children, Ugandan Support has a vision to provide opportunities beyond schooling, by helping Ugandan youth prepare for adult life.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hampshire
- Surrey
- Uganda
Governance
- 30 March 2000: Standard registration
- 17 June 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- US (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.48k | £1.33k | £150 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.05k | £0 | £843 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 January 2022 | 68 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 December 2020 | 32 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 06 March 2020 | 127 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 26 MAY 1999 AS AMENDED ON 26 FEBRUARY 2000.
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY AMONG CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND THEIR CARERS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window