THE FRIENDS OF OMBERSLEY ENDOWED FIRST SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raising funds for extra school equipment and events
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 08 November 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Billie Louise Norman | Trustee | 04 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emily Jones | Trustee | 09 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laura Sampson-Coe | Trustee | 09 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Fortey | Trustee | 09 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Emma Hartley | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.60k | £4.41k | £3.65k | £6.86k | £6.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.50k | £5.01k | £5.31k | £6.06k | £7.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 02 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 04 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 August 2020 | 01 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 JULY 1999 as amended on 29 Feb 2024
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED, IN PRACTICE OMBERSLEY/DROITWICH, WORCESTERSHIRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ombersley Endowed First School
Droitwich Road
Ombersley
DROITWICH
Worcestershire
WR9 0DR
- Phone:
- 01905622575
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window