THE ART ACADEMY

Charity number: 1078804
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 COVID filing extension granted Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 23 August 2020 54 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 23 August 2020 54 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 05 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 05 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 22 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 22 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 06 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 06 June 2017 On time Download