THE ART ACADEMY

Charity number: 1078804
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £1.59m £1.68m £1.78m £1.65m £1.37m
Total expenditure £1.26m £1.49m £1.72m £1.64m £1.49m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £12.50k N/A £139.47k
Income - Donations and legacies £44.68k £11.25k £22.95k £3.59k £223.14k
Income - Other trading activities £81.44k £91.99k £102.92k £119.02k £79.49k
Income - Charitable activities £1.46m £1.49m £1.56m £1.53m £1.03m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £945 £708 £525 £1.00k £1.27k
Income - Other £0 £83.79k £97.04k £0 £35.03k
Income - Legacies £0 £5.02k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.17m £1.27m £1.58m £1.53m £1.29m
Expenditure - Raising funds £98.63k £0 £130.60k £110.03k £86.82k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £4.13k £11.34k £0 £231
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £11.43k
Expenditure - Other £0 £221.72k £7.97k £1.82k £112.78k