Trustees SHELL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1080999
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Wael Sawan Trustee 11 October 2019
None on record
Gail Alfreda Klintworth Trustee 09 January 2019
None on record
Alice Georgina Chapple Trustee 06 June 2017
None on record
MS Diane Lisa Carney Trustee 06 June 2017
None on record
SINEAD LYNCH Trustee 11 January 2017
THE SHELL CENTENARY SCHOLARSHIP FUND
PROF MAGGIE KIGOZI Trustee 21 November 2015
None on record