ST. JAMES' SCHOOL PARENT STAFF ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1079188
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £9.09k £3.65k £6.69k £6.84k £6.70k
Total expenditure £8.74k £7.34k £6.22k £5.59k £3.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A