Financial history YOUTH ALIYAH - CHILD RESCUE

Charity number: 1077913
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £2.65m £1.12m £1.12m £863.11k £667.61k
Total expenditure £936.89k £1.41m £1.21m £1.14m £997.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £39.62k £11.89k
Income - Donations and legacies £2.49m £670.68k £881.23k £601.49k £551.06k
Income - Other trading activities £114.95k £442.00k £169.77k £150.05k £33.10k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £47.92k £5.91k £68.64k £71.96k £71.56k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £39.62k £11.89k
Income - Legacies £1.80m £202.86k £387.74k £30.32k £13.10k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £839.07k £1.17m £986.71k £949.72k £848.65k
Expenditure - Raising funds £97.82k £234.40k £227.54k £192.65k £148.80k
Expenditure - Governance £25.68k £22.37k £18.73k £19.03k £16.28k
Expenditure - Grants institution £622.77k £972.22k £854.95k £842.86k £767.09k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £24.45k £21.44k £19.08k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0