Financial history RAINBOW FILM SOCIETY

Charity number: 1081512
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £10.79k £23.13k £21.30k £20.07k £7.10k
Total expenditure £10.30k £19.09k £26.02k £17.98k £12.41k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.00k £3.50k £4.00k N/A N/A