Trustees THE MARY POTTER CONVENT HOSPITAL TRUST
Charity number: 1078525

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Clunie | Trustee | 28 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Hollingworth | Trustee | 23 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
GODFREY ARCHER | Trustee | 13 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
SHAUN FINN | Trustee | 28 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
AIDAN GOULDING | Trustee | 28 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN WITHERSPOON | Trustee | 25 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
SISTER JEANNETTE CONNELL | Trustee | 16 November 2011 |
|
|||||
MERVYN BERNARD JONES | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.