Financial history ALLEXTON / NEW PARKS JUNIOR FOOTBALL CLUB SUPPORTERS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1082323
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £7.69k £19.08k £12.69k £52.26k £7.18k
Total expenditure £10.25k £11.37k £2.97k £28.55k £7.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A