GUINEA-BISSAU BRITISH TRUST FOR DEVELOPMENT PROMOTION AND SUPPORT(GBXO/UK-TRUST)

Charity number: 1078487
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 March 2020 29 March 2021 58 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 March 2019 21 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 March 2018 21 May 2019 111 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 March 2017 21 May 2019 476 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 March 2016 10 March 2017 39 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2016 Not Required