DUDLEY LODGE

Charity number: 1078207
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Caroline Wilson Trustee 10 December 2020
CASTEL FROMA NEURO CARE LIMITED Received: On time
JULIE SULLIVAN Trustee 22 May 2014
COVENTRY RAPE AND SEXUAL ABUSE CENTRE LTD Received: On time
Jane Anne Flynn Trustee 10 December 2020 None on record
JENNIFER ANN HAILEY Trustee None on record
Peter Roach Chair 01 March 2018 None on record
Peter Maddock Trustee 26 September 2019 None on record
Kenneth David Churchill Trustee 26 September 2019 None on record
Keith Robert Scrivens Trustee 31 October 2018 None on record