WIRRAL CHURCHES' ARK PROJECT

Charity number: 1079070
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £1.01m £1.00m £906.57k £990.84k £1.05m
Total expenditure £1.01m £1.00m £869.87k £1.07m £1.14m
Income from government contracts £888.17k £921.85k £622.12k £350.00k £467.93k
Income from government grants £16.89k £0 £0 £17.00k £16.89k
Income - Donations and legacies £107.32k £68.96k £109.30k £139.73k £161.59k
Income - Other trading activities £10.02k £5.77k £172.59k £291.20k £354.34k
Income - Charitable activities £888.17k £921.85k £622.12k £558.70k £528.78k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.85k £3.22k £1.04k £1.22k £1.39k
Income - Other £0 £1.84k £1.53k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £43.52k £0 £42.01k £0 £34.72k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £822.92k £817.54k £709.84k £814.71k £1.14m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £183.54k £0 £0 £254.14k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £183.01k £160.02k £254.14k £0