CROYDON CHILDMINDING ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Croydon Childminding Association Mission Statement April 2004. What we aim to achieve as an association: To provide support and information to existing & prospective childminders in Croydon. Thus enabling them to maintain & develop their quality childminding service. To promote childminding as a positive childcare choice to carers & the local community as a whole. Offer support & information, rega
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Croydon
Governance
- 23 December 1999: Standard registration
- CCMA (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Natalie Wright | Chair | 24 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Drummond | Trustee | 20 December 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.34k | £3.54k | £3.43k | £3.29k | £3.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.60k | £302 | £175 | £48 | £40 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26TH APRIL 1999
Charitable objects
THE ASSOCIATION EXISTS TO PROMOTE THE OBJECTS OF THE NATIONAL CHILDMINDING ASSOCIATION IN THE LOCALITY NAMELY:- (A) TO PROMOTE THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE DAILY CARE, RECREATION AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND PARTICULARLY CHILDREN UNDER THE AGE OF 8 YEARS AND PROMOTE THE OBSERVANCE OF GOOD STANDARDS OF CHILDMINDING PROVIDING SUCH FACILITIES. (B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF CHILDMINDERS AND OTHER PERSONS AND ORGANISATIONS PROVIDING DAY CARE FACILITIES FOR CHILDREN AND PARTICULARLY CHILDREN UNDER 8 YEARS AND CONDUCT RESEARCH INTO ALL ASPECTS FOR THE CARE, RECREATION AND EDUCATION OF SUCH CHILDREN, AND PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
THE LONDON BOROUGH OF CROYDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
6D Warminster Road
LONDON
SE25 4DZ
- Phone:
- 07737097965
- Email:
- croydoncma@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window