Accounts and annual returns COUNCIL FOR DANCE, DRAMA AND MUSICAL THEATRE

Charity number: 1079153
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2021 24 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 24 November 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 29 February 2020 11 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 11 November 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2019 20 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 20 November 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2018 31 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 31 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2017 29 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017 29 November 2017 On time Download Open in new window