MASJID-E-USMAN AND MADRASAH TRUST BOLTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious educations
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bolton
Governance
- 10 September 2001: Standard registration
- MASJID-E-USMAN (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BABU PATEL | Trustee | 22 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Faruk Essap | Trustee | 14 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
MAHEBOOB PATEL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MOHAMED FARUK ISMAIL ALI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ILYAS VALI KHANAT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £75.80k | £58.10k | £77.22k | £85.46k | £91.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £62.91k | £43.37k | £51.59k | £55.07k | £58.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2024
(These accounts |
27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 July 2024 | 152 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2023
(These accounts |
01 July 2024 | 152 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 March 2023 | 32 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2022
(These accounts |
04 March 2023 | 32 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2021
(These accounts |
25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 March 2021 | 53 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2020
(These accounts |
25 March 2021 | 53 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 10 JULY 2000 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 8 DECEMBER 2003 as amended on 12 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE RELIGION OF ISLAM IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES AND BELIEFS OF AHLE SUNNAT WAL JAMAAT AND OF THE DEOBANDI SCHOOL OF THOUGHT BY ESTABLISHING A MOSQUE AS A PLACE OF WORSHIP AND BY ESTABLISHING A MADRASAH FOR THE TEACHING OF THE HOLY QUR'AN, AQAEED(ISLAMIC BELIEFS), THE BASICS OF ISLAM AND OTHER RELATED SUBJECTS TO MUSLIM CHILDREN
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
82 ASTLEY STREET
BOLTON
BL1 8EY
- Phone:
- 07894488923
- Email:
- masjideusman82@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window