Accounts and annual returns THE FRIENDS OF ST. JOHN'S SCHOOL, DIGSWELL

Charity number: 1077943
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 27 February 2021 23 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 27 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2020 22 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2020 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2019 13 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2018 12 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2017 09 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017 Not Required