WOOD STREET MISSION

Charity number: 1078337
Charity reporting is 28 days late
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 Not yet received
28 days overdue
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not yet received
28 days overdue
Annual return 31 December 2018 15 November 2019 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 15 November 2019 15 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 18 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 18 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 29 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 29 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 13 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 13 October 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)