DOBCROFT AFTER SCHOOL HOURS CARE (DASH)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of a safe, friendly environment for the daily care, recreation and learning of children aged 4 to 11 years during out of school hours.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 09 November 1999: Standard registration
- DASH (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adam Hamilton Hathcock | Chair | 24 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Angela Jane Oliver | Trustee | 24 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jade Roxann Rose | Trustee | 28 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Julia Swainson | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Therese Collins | Trustee | 04 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Ann Briers-Cutts | Trustee | 01 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Anna Jane Cantrell | Trustee | 01 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Sexton | Trustee | 10 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Shilani Watkinson | Trustee | 05 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE ROWLAND | Trustee | 10 February 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £236.54k | £214.13k | £242.07k | £317.32k | £307.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £216.92k | £211.71k | £228.82k | £297.91k | £332.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £28.56k | £17.93k | £694 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 07 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 07 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 22 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 22 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 21 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 21 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 05 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 05 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 22 JULY 1999
Charitable objects
1. TO PROVIDE A SAFE, FRIENDLY ENVIRONMENT FOR THE DAILY CARE, RECREATION AND LEARNING OF CHILDREN AGED 4-11 YEARS DURING OUT OF SCHOOL HOURS 2. SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
DASH mobile
c/o Dobcroft Junior School
Pingle Road
SHEFFIELD
- Phone:
- 07972913689
- Email:
- dashcommittee@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window