NORTH OF ENGLAND DALMATIAN CLUB WELFARE SERVICE

Charity number: 1084382
Charity reporting is overdue by 34 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 34 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 34 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 26 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 23 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 07 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required