NORTH OF ENGLAND DALMATIAN CLUB WELFARE SERVICE

Charity number: 1084382
Charity reporting is overdue by 31 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £13.55k £8.10k £13.13k £12.64k £2.70k
Total expenditure £7.17k £13.87k £11.06k £9.51k £5.10k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A