SALTBURN ARTISTS PROJECTS LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of studio space for local artists. Mounting exhibitions for community benefit. Managing workshops on a variety of artistic topics.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Redcar And Cleveland
Governance
- 27 June 2000: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pamela Bennett | Chair | 12 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Martha Margaretha Roddam | Trustee | 04 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Maureen Coade | Trustee | 04 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sara Henry | Trustee | 04 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Richard Caedmon Spence Parker | Trustee | 04 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Charles Robert Twist | Trustee | 04 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Ann Parker | Trustee | 04 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Claude Jean frere-smith | Trustee | 14 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
REUBEN KENCH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GLYNIS JOHNSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.56k | £23.53k | £16.63k | £18.56k | £26.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.10k | £19.32k | £20.37k | £23.32k | £22.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 5 OCTOBER 1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION ON 21 MARCH 2000
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ALL FORMS OF ART, ESPECIALLY IN, BUT NOT NECESSARILY LIMITED TO REDCAR AND CLEVELAND
Area of benefit
ESPECIALLY IN, BUT NOT NECESSARILY LIMITED TO REDCAR AND CLEVELAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
30-32 MARSKE ROAD
SALTBURN BY THE SEA
CLEVELAND
TS12 1QG
- Phone:
- 01287626060
- Email:
- info@saltburnstudios.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window