Accounts and annual returns MONTGOMERYSHIRE EMERGENCY DOCTORS

Charity number: 1082604
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 28 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 06 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 15 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 13 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 12 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required