Financial history MONTGOMERYSHIRE EMERGENCY DOCTORS

Charity number: 1082604
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £10.25k £9.33k £7.49k £8.30k £10.34k
Total expenditure £3.47k £7.29k £3.96k £21.65k £1.88k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A