TAVISTOCK & DISTRICT LOCAL TRANSPORT PARTNERSHIP

Charity number: 1079282
Charity reporting is 764 days late
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Not yet received
33 days overdue
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not yet received
33 days overdue
Annual return 31 March 2019 Not yet received
399 days overdue
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not yet received
399 days overdue
Annual return 31 March 2018 10 September 2019 222 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not yet received
764 days overdue
Annual return 31 March 2017 31 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

( These accounts
have been qualified)

22 May 2018 111 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 31 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016

( These accounts
have been qualified)

31 May 2017 120 days late Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)