TAVISTOCK & DISTRICT LOCAL TRANSPORT PARTNERSHIP

Charity number: 1079282
Charity reporting is overdue by 811 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018
Total gross income £83.11k £84.33k £92.87k £107.53k £80.96k
Total expenditure £83.12k £84.97k £85.04k £99.36k £90.23k
Income from government contracts N/A £46.21k £55.81k £74.51k £43.43k
Income from government grants N/A £30.73k £29.56k £25.32k £30.82k