ARISE AND GLOW

Charity number: 1080498
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 07 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 07 June 2021 342 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Overdue Overdue by 455 days
Annual return 31 August 2018 07 June 2021 708 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Overdue Overdue by 821 days
Annual return 31 August 2017 29 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 26 July 2017 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required