Accounts and annual returns NSU-EHIME MBANO COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1079364
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 10 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 10 May 2025 191 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 10 May 2025 557 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 01 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 01 October 2022 335 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required