Accounts and annual returns LEO HOUSE CHILDREN'S HOSPICE

Charity number: 1091541
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 20 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 25 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 25 February 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2019 27 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 14 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 14 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2017 22 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 22 December 2017 On time Download Open in new window