AL-UKHUWWAT TRUST

Charity number: 1078960
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2021 06 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2020 12 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2019 28 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2018 05 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2017 29 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2017 Not Required