AL-UKHUWWAT TRUST

Charity number: 1078960
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021
Total gross income £15.17k £17.19k £15.26k £16.83k £11.98k
Total expenditure £11.25k £9.06k £12.61k £11.49k £4.63k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A