GLOUCESTERSHIRE ACADEMY OF MUSIC LIMITED

Charity number: 1085708
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Gillian Margaret Greenwell Trustee 12 April 2021 None on record
Dr Damian Kenny Trustee 03 October 2018
GLOUCESTERSHIRE SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA Received: On time
FLAVIA JONES Trustee None on record
Vivienne Manuelita Rae Hargreaves Trustee 20 March 2013 None on record
Gayathiri Gowri Shankar Trustee 01 September 2019 None on record
JANET ELAINE PAYNE HALL Trustee None on record
MR TOM TAYLOR Trustee None on record
Stephen Philip Belinfante Trustee 21 January 2015 None on record
James Henrik Webster Trustee 01 June 2018 None on record
anthony veazey Trustee 25 July 2003 None on record