WEST VIEW ADVICE AND RESOURCE CENTRE LIMITED

Charity number: 1084632
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 15 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 15 November 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 08 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 03 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 03 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 08 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 08 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 04 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 04 October 2017 On time Download