Financial history WEST VIEW ADVICE AND RESOURCE CENTRE LIMITED

Charity number: 1084632
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £346.31k £379.56k £323.43k £383.87k £343.10k
Total expenditure £399.30k £351.91k £329.44k £323.18k £322.42k
Income from government contracts £110.00k £110.00k £115.66k £131.62k £113.52k
Income from government grants £0 £500 N/A £19.97k £36.80k