Accounts and annual returns MANKIND INITIATIVE

Charity number: 1089547
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2021 05 August 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2021 05 August 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2020 20 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 20 August 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2019 30 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 30 September 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2018 23 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 23 July 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2017 08 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2017 08 August 2018 On time Download Open in new window