Financial history MANKIND INITIATIVE

Charity number: 1089547
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2017 30/11/2018 30/11/2019 30/11/2020 30/11/2021
Total gross income £158.95k £150.31k £256.06k £198.85k £156.63k
Total expenditure £44.54k £114.07k £197.18k £91.76k £89.89k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £103.70k £182.07k £114.86k £55.74k