Trustees MANKIND INITIATIVE

Charity number: 1089547
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MARK BROOKS Chair 09 October 2007
THE MEN AND BOYS COALITION
Received: On time
Jonathan Eagle-Service Trustee 29 June 2019
None on record
Paul Chivers Trustee 09 June 2018
None on record
Dr Ben Hine Trustee 25 November 2017
None on record
Dr Sarah Wallace Trustee 16 September 2017
None on record
DR Elizabeth Bates Trustee 21 May 2016
None on record
Lori Busch Trustee 15 November 2010
None on record
MRS ROZ WILLIS Trustee
None on record