THE OLD SILHILLIANS TRUST

Charity number: 1078706
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 26 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 25 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 23 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 18 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2016 13 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 Not Required