FRIENDS OF PRIORY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1079484
Charity reporting is overdue by 758 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 27 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 27 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 Overdue Overdue by 392 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Overdue Overdue by 392 days
Annual return 31 August 2018 Overdue Overdue by 758 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Overdue Overdue by 758 days
Annual return 31 August 2017 03 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 20 October 2017 112 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required