THE CONNECTION AT ST MARTIN-IN-THE-FIELDS

Charity number: 1078201
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £4.49m £4.57m £4.92m £4.84m £5.21m
Total expenditure £4.50m £4.98m £5.15m £4.85m £5.50m
Income from government contracts £807.93k £964.36k £874.82k £874.82k N/A
Income from government grants £537.84k £655.70k £407.53k £390.83k £824.60k
Income - Donations and legacies £3.46m £2.27m £3.03m £3.10m £3.50m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £155.08k £120.39k £108.82k £111.84k
Income - Charitable activities £1.02m £2.14m £1.76m £1.63m £1.58m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £10.65k £7.41k £2.39k £6.96k £15.35k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £404.82k £74.22k £290.41k £635.93k £448.21k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.16m £4.64m £4.70m £4.40m £4.96m
Expenditure - Raising funds £334.37k £340.85k £448.83k £448.91k £516.32k
Expenditure - Governance £9.47k £19.66k £22.81k £11.19k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £19.23k