THE CONNECTION AT ST MARTIN-IN-THE-FIELDS

Charity number: 1078201
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jill Kyne Trustee 04 December 2018 None on record
TIM JONES Trustee 04 March 2014
SAFER LONDON Received: 4 days late
Catherine Cherry Trustee 14 December 2020 None on record
Maeve Walsh Trustee 14 December 2020 None on record
Simon David Myles Rawson Trustee 17 July 2018 None on record
Peter John Curtis Warren Trustee 17 July 2018
GIRLS' EDUCATION COMPANY LTD Received: On time
Keith Andrew Starling Trustee 17 July 2018 None on record
Rev SAMUEL MARTIN WELLS Trustee 14 January 2013
BISHOP HO MING WAH ASSOCIATION AND COMMUNITY CENTRE Received: 10 days late
DIVERSE CHURCH Received: On time
Chandra Jean McGowan Trustee 17 July 2018 None on record