KINGS NYMPTON PARISH HALL

Charity number: 1113721
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £12.02k £16.17k £20.68k £16.92k £14.92k
Total expenditure £6.56k £18.83k £11.72k £10.93k £19.56k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £3.00k £3.00k £3.00k £3.00k £3.00k