SIKH NARI MANCH U.K.

Charity number: 1093192
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £33.01k £49.73k £47.68k £48.44k £49.44k
Total expenditure £37.38k £37.85k £39.76k £34.33k £44.81k
Income from government contracts £7.43k £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.60k £0 N/A N/A N/A