FRIENDS OF GRAVES PARK

Charity number: 1080407
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To assist other Trusts with interests in Graves Park in enhancing and maintaining the park for leisure, education and conservation in conjunction with the local community and in particular the citizens of Sheffield. To preserve the fauna and flora for the benefit and enjoyment of park users. To act as a conduit in raising funds to achieve those objects.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £149,328
Total expenditure: £144,895

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Sheffield City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 April 2000: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CAROLINE D DEWAR Chair
None on record
Peter Robert Bragg Trustee 28 November 2024
None on record
Maureen Edwards Trustee 28 November 2024
None on record
Philip Kent Hobson Trustee 03 October 2023
None on record
David Hartlebury Trustee 03 July 2019
None on record
ERNEST WILLIAM BREWIN Trustee
None on record
BARBARA GREATOREX Trustee
None on record
STEVEN CHAPMAN Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £36.95k £9.55k £5.56k £10.42k £149.33k
Total expenditure £38.85k £1.35k £3.91k £4.86k £144.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 28 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 28 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 05 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 22 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 24 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 18 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 18 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
141 MOUNT VIEW ROAD
SHEFFIELD
S8 8PJ
Phone:
01142589562