Trustees CAMPHILL FAMILIES AND FRIENDS

Charity number: 1078930
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
THE HONOURABLE MRS MARY PEARSON Chair
None on record
Christopher John Hazlehurst Trustee 10 May 2018
None on record
Jane Vizard Trustee 14 October 2017
None on record
Dr Anna Eddleston Trustee 14 October 2017
None on record
Clare Woodcock Trustee 14 October 2017
None on record
NICKY FERGUSON Trustee 20 October 2015
None on record
JACQUELINE AMANDA SPENCER Trustee 10 April 2014
CLARE'S PLACE
Received: On time
GODFREY DAVEY Trustee 28 July 2011
None on record
JEREMY RICHARD TREVETHICK Trustee 19 July 2011
None on record