Accounts and annual returns NEWBOLD PARISH CHURCH PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1084204
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 25 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 25 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 22 July 2021 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 22 July 2021 22 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 30 September 2020 92 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 30 September 2020 92 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 02 July 2019 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 02 July 2019 2 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 18 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

18 June 2018 On time Download Open in new window