Financial history NEWBOLD PARISH CHURCH PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1084204
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £89.06k £137.69k £93.24k £141.00k £167.65k
Total expenditure £102.55k £174.10k £176.38k £129.00k £172.54k
Income from government contracts £71.49k £110.20k £61.43k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £5.39k £280 N/A £17.00k N/A