Financial history UNITED CHURCH OF GOD BRITISH ISLES

Charity number: 1079192
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £219.82k £246.75k £245.05k £246.59k £252.52k
Total expenditure £240.33k £230.78k £236.80k £262.17k £216.42k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A