ACTION GROUP FOR ETHIOPIANS IN EALING

Charity number: 1084710
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/10/2015 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019
Total gross income £15 £13 £13 £13 £13
Total expenditure £13 £13 £13 £13 £13
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A